TN HB0810 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Graduate Physicians Act." - Amends TCA Title 49; Title 63 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "Graduate Physicians Act." - Amends TCA Title 49; Title 63 and Title 68.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee of Health Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 4/2/2019
2019-03-26HouseReassigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee
2019-02-26HouseReturned to Clerk's desk.
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 2/26/2019
2019-02-19HouseAction Def. in s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee to 2/26/2019
2019-02-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 2/19/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0672 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health & Welfare Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback