TN HB0805 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies that reports of findings and recommendations by the elevator and amusement device safety board on technical issues be transmitted to the commissioner of labor and workforce development for final disposition within 10 business days of the completion of such reports. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 62 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, specifies that reports of findings and recommendations by the elevator and amusement device safety board on technical issues be transmitted to the commissioner of labor and workforce development for final disposition within 10 business days of the completion of such reports. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 62 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/21/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0457 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee