TN HB0795 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of education to provide a written report at least annually that details the evidence of validity in teacher evaluations, the areas needed for improvement, and efforts being made to improve validity. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires the department of education to provide a written report at least annually that details the evidence of validity in teacher evaluations, the areas needed for improvement, and efforts being made to improve validity. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Andy Holt [R] | Rep. Sheila Butt [R] | Rep. Joe Pitts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Meeting Cancelled. Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee to 3/22/17 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee to 3/15/2017 |
2017-02-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0774 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee