TN HB0794 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 435
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 435
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows premises authorized to serve wine to also serve high alcohol content beer; requires that the training for applicants for server permits consist of not less than 3.5 hours of alcohol awareness training; clarifies the premises contained in authorization for certain establishments to sell alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption to include tables and chairs contiguous to the outside front wall of a licensee's building; and clarifies that other authorization for designating contiguous areas of the licensee's premises also applies to manufacturers who are licensed to sell at retail on their premises. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 3, Part 7 and Title 57, Chapter 4.
Title
As enacted, allows premises authorized to serve wine to also serve high alcohol content beer; requires that the training for applicants for server permits consist of not less than 3.5 hours of alcohol awareness training; clarifies the premises contained in authorization for certain establishments to sell alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption to include tables and chairs contiguous to the outside front wall of a licensee's building; and clarifies that other authorization for designating contiguous areas of the licensee's premises also applies to manufacturers who are licensed to sell at retail on their premises. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 3, Part 7 and Title 57, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
Rep. Barbara Cooper [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 435 | |
2019-05-29 | Effective date(s) 05/22/2019 | |
2019-05-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-15 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-02 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 27, Nays 3, PNV 1 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0330) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0057) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-23 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 73, Nays 15, PNV 5 |
2019-04-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0318) |
2019-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 4/9/2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Action def. in State Committee to 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Action def. in State Committee to 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1082 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 435