TN HB0793 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a local board of education from increasing the salary or compensation for the director of schools to an amount higher than the salary of the governor. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, prohibits a local board of education from increasing the salary or compensation for the director of schools to an amount higher than the salary of the governor. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Sparks [R] | Rep. Jimmy Matlock [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Jerry Sexton [R] |
Rep. Judd Matheny [R] | Rep. James Van Huss [R] | Rep. Andy Holt [R] | Rep. Timothy Hill [R] |
Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Sheila Butt [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] |
Rep. Mike Carter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 2/13/2018 |
2018-01-30 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 2/13/2018 |
2018-01-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 1/30/2018 |
2018-01-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-16 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 1/30/2018 |
2018-01-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 1/16/2018 |
2017-04-04 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 1st Calendar of 2018 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/14/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0731 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee