TN HB0790 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Failed in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Failed in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, restores longevity pay for employees of the executive branch in the service of the state hired after June 30, 2015. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 38.
Title
As introduced, restores longevity pay for employees of the executive branch in the service of the state hired after June 30, 2015. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 38.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | Failed in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Meeting Cancelled. Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/22/17 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/15/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/8/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0765 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee