TN HB0785 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/12/2021; 07/01/2021; 10/01/2021; 01/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/12/2021; 07/01/2021; 10/01/2021; 01/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Reentry Success Act of 2021". - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 12; Title 40; Title 41, Chapter 4; Title 41, Chapter 8; Title 49, Chapter 11; Title 49, Chapter 8; Title 55, Chapter 50 and Section 62-76-104.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 12; Title 40; Title 41, Chapter 4; Title 41, Chapter 8; Title 49, Chapter 11; Title 49, Chapter 8; Title 55, Chapter 50 and Section 62-76-104, relative to offender reentry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 81 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY GRIFFEY PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 80 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY GRIFFEY PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 76 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 81 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY GRIFFEY PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 80 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY GRIFFEY PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 76 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Effective date(s) 05/12/2021; 07/01/2021; 10/01/2021; 01/01/2022 | |
2021-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 410 | |
2021-05-12 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-28 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-22 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-22 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2021-04-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA0296) |
2021-04-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0295) |
2021-04-22 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0136) |
2021-04-22 | House | Am. tabled. (Amendment 5 - HA0380) |
2021-04-22 | House | Am. tabled. (Amendment 4 - HA0378) |
2021-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2021 |
2021-04-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-29 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/29/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee -- Government Operations for Review |
2021-02-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0768 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 410