TN HB0784 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 409
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, allows the department to contract with entities and organizations, including local governments, to create or operate community-based alternatives to incarceration; rewrites various provisions regarding community corrections, probation, probation revocation, and release on bail. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8, Chapter 4, Part 1; Section 16-3-810; Title 16, Chapter 22; Title 16, Chapter 3; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 8, Chapter 4, Part 1; Section 16-3-810; Title 16, Chapter 22; Title 16, Chapter 3; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41, relative to alternatives to incarceration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18 Pub. Ch. 409
2021-05-18 Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
2021-05-12 Signed by Governor.
2021-05-04HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2021-05-03SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-04-30HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-04-28HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2021-04-28SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2021-04-28SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0253)
2021-04-28SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0112)
2021-04-28SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2021-04-26SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2021-04-22HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-04-22HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 89, Nays 1, PNV 0
2021-04-22HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0294)
2021-04-22HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0135)
2021-04-22HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 4 - HA0381)
2021-04-22HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 3 - HA0379)
2021-04-15HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2021
2021-04-14HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2021
2021-04-13HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-04-07HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/13/2021
2021-04-07HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-03-31HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/7/2021
2021-03-29HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2021-03-29HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-03-25HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/29/2021
2021-03-24HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
2021-03-17HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/24/2021
2021-03-17HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2021-03-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2021
2021-02-20HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2021-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee -- Government Operations for Review
2021-02-10HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-09HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0767 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 409

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback