TN HB0781 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates the professional art therapist advisory committee of the board of examiners in psychology to regulate the practice of art therapy. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 63.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, creates the professional art therapist advisory committee of the board of examiners in psychology to regulate the practice of art therapy. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 63.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee of Health Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 3/12/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee-- Government Operations for Review
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0055 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Government Operations Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback