TN HB0780 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-13)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates a presumption that a firefighter or emergency medical services personnel diagnosed with post-traumatic stress disorder (PTSD) sustained the injury in the line of duty for purposes of workers' compensation; allows for the presumption to be rebutted by evidence that the PTSD was caused by nonservice-connected risk factors or exposure. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51, Part 2; Title 50, Chapter 6 and Title 56.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, creates a presumption that a firefighter or emergency medical services personnel diagnosed with post-traumatic stress disorder (PTSD) sustained the injury in the line of duty for purposes of workers' compensation; allows for the presumption to be rebutted by evidence that the PTSD was caused by nonservice-connected risk factors or exposure. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51, Part 2; Title 50, Chapter 6 and Title 56.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0200 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-18 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback