TN HB0777 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 2018
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the treasurer to invest 40 percent of the funds in the rainy day fund in gold bullion or other precious metal bullion; requires the treasurer to contract with a bank in the state to store the bullion at no cost to the state. - Amends TCA Title 9.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the treasurer to invest 40 percent of the funds in the rainy day fund in gold bullion or other precious metal bullion; requires the treasurer to contract with a bank in the state to store the bullion at no cost to the state. - Amends TCA Title 9.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-29HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 2018
2017-03-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
2017-03-22HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/29/2017
2017-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/22/2017
2017-03-01HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-02-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/1/2017
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2017-02-13HouseP2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-02-09HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-02-08HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0973 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-13 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback