TN HB0776 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 391
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires, rather than encourages, all public middle and elementary schools to place one or more automated external defibrillator (AED) devices within the school. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 68, Chapter 140, Part 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires, rather than encourages, all public middle and elementary schools to place one or more automated external defibrillator (AED) devices within the school. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 68, Chapter 140, Part 4.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 391
2019-04-30HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-04-29HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019
2019-04-24HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/29/2019
2019-04-24HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-24HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/24/2019
2019-04-24HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/25/2019
2019-04-03HousePlaced behind the budget
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
2019-03-27HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-03-27HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Education for 3/27/2019
2019-03-20HouseNo Action Taken
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Education for 3/20/2019
2019-03-13HouseNo Action Taken
2019-03-06HousePlaced on cal. Education for 3/13/2019
2019-03-06HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education
2019-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/6/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Education
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1135 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 391

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback