TN HB0772 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies that the seizure and forfeiture of vehicles is applicable after certain DUI violations, rather than convictions. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10.
Title
As introduced, specifies that the seizure and forfeiture of vehicles is applicable after certain DUI violations, rather than convictions. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. John DeBerry [D] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Reassigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2019-03-12 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/12/2019 |
2019-03-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0502 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee