TN HB0769 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 63
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 63
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes requirement that department veteran service officers be combat veterans. - Amends TCA Title 58, Chapter 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 58, Chapter 3, relative to state service officers appointed to assist veterans.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] |
Rep. John Crawford [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 63 | |
2021-03-15 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-03-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-11 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/15/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/11/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0763 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-06 - Effective date(s) 03/29/2021