TN HB0769 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from October 31 to October 1 the date by which the departments of education and health are required to jointly compile an annual report to the governor and the general assembly of self-administered medications and healthcare procedures. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, changes from October 31 to October 1 the date by which the departments of education and health are required to jointly compile an annual report to the governor and the general assembly of self-administered medications and healthcare procedures. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Chris Hurt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee |
2019-03-26 | House | Ref. to Education |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1187 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee