TN HB0765 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits a prescriber who is not a patient's obstetrical or gynecological provider to prescribe buprenorphine products to certain patients if the prescriber is a member of the same specialty practice group as the patient's obstetrical or gynecological provider. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 53 and Title 63.
Title
As introduced, permits a prescriber who is not a patient's obstetrical or gynecological provider to prescribe buprenorphine products to certain patients if the prescriber is a member of the same specialty practice group as the patient's obstetrical or gynecological provider. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 53 and Title 63.
Sponsors
Rep. Harold Love [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee for 2/19/2020 |
2019-04-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2020 |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Mental Health & Substance Abuse Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0767 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee