TN HB0761 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Youth Mental Health Safety Act." - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 47, Chapter 18, relative to devices capable of accessing the internet.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-21HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
2023-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 3/21/2023
2023-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
2023-02-06HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-02-02HouseP2C, ref. to Commerce Committee
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0138 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-20 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to first calendar of 2024

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback