TN HB0760 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, waives lifetime enhanced handgun carry permit fees for state residents who are retired veterans of the United States armed forces. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1351.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 39-17-1351, relative to military veterans.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-18HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2023-04-12HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2023
2023-04-12HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to Driver's License Calendar
2023-04-05HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/12/2023
2023-04-05HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2023-04-05HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2023-03-29HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/5/2023
2023-03-29HouseAction def. in Civil Justice Committee to 4/5/2023
2023-03-22HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/29/2023
2023-03-21HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2023-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/21/2023
2023-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2023-02-02HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0521 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback