TN HB0757 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 114
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 114
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that neither a franchisee nor a franchisee's employee shall be deemed to be an employee of the franchisor for any purpose, notwithstanding any voluntary agreement between the U.S. department of labor and a franchisee. - Amends TCA Title 47 and Title 50.
Title
As enacted, clarifies that neither a franchisee nor a franchisee's employee shall be deemed to be an employee of the franchisor for any purpose, notwithstanding any voluntary agreement between the U.S. department of labor and a franchisee. - Amends TCA Title 47 and Title 50.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Holt [R] | Rep. Tilman Goins [R] | Rep. Jim Coley [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - House - CONSUMER AND HUMAN RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Business and Utilities Committee (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - CONSUMER AND HUMAN RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - CONSUMER AND HUMAN RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 114 | |
2015-03-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-30 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-03-26 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/30/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/26/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/18/2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Business and Utilities Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Business and Utilities Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 3/4/2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 2/25/2015 |
2015-02-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee |
2015-02-18 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee--Business & Utilities |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0475 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-20 - Pub. Ch. 114