TN HB0756 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 97
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 97
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes the deployment, implementation, or use of a motor carrier safety improvement required by a motor carrier from being considered when evaluating a person's status as an employee or independent contractor. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 50; Title 54; Title 55 and Title 65.
Title
As enacted, removes the deployment, implementation, or use of a motor carrier safety improvement required by a motor carrier from being considered when evaluating a person's status as an employee or independent contractor. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 50; Title 54; Title 55 and Title 65.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Marsh [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Pub. Ch. 97 | |
2019-04-09 | Effective date(s) 03/28/2019 | |
2019-03-28 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-03-20 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-03-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-03-14 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0071) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-03-07 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-03-07 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 84, Nays 0, PNV 2 |
2019-03-07 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0010) |
2019-02-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/7/2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/28/2019 |
2019-02-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-19 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 2/19/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0663 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 97