TN HB0755 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, designates the segment of State Route 66 from its intersection with State Route 160 in Hamblen County to its intersection with Interstate 81 at Exit 4 in Jefferson County as a scenic highway. - Amends TCA Title 54, Chapter 17.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 54, Chapter 17, relative to scenic roadways.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-18HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2023-04-12HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2023
2023-03-08HousePlaced behind the budget
2023-03-01HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/8/2023
2023-03-01HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2023-02-28HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2023-02-22HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 2/28/2023
2023-02-22HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
2023-02-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/22/2023
2023-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
2023-02-02HouseP2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1364 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback