TN HB0755 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 471
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 471
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions governing textbooks and instructional materials; prohibits public school teachers and principals from using or permitting the use of textbooks and instructional materials created to align exclusively with the Common Core State Standards or that are marketed or otherwise identified as Common Core textbooks or materials. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-2203 and Section 49-6-2206.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 49-6-2203 and Section 49-6-2206, relative to textbooks.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] |
Rep. Rebecca Alexander [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 471 | |
2021-04-21 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2021 |
2021-04-12 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/12/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee to 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction -- Government Operations for Review |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0630 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-21 - Effective date(s) 05/18/2021,07/01/2021