TN HB0753 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds a patient's residence and place of employment, if equipped to engage in telehealth communications, as locations a patient may be and receive telehealth services covered by health insurance; revises other telehealth provisions. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Title
As introduced, adds a patient's residence and place of employment, if equipped to engage in telehealth communications, as locations a patient may be and receive telehealth services covered by health insurance; revises other telehealth provisions. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 4/9/2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | Action def. in Insurance Committee to 4/9/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee for 3/27/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1169 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-16 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 2020