TN HB0744 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the district attorneys general conference to submit a report to the chairs of the judiciary committee of the senate and the criminal justice committee of the house as to whether separate and secure waiting areas exist within each of the 31 judicial districts along with recommendations to achieve the requirements of law that victims of crime and prosecution witnesses should be provided waiting areas that are separate and secure from the defendant or defense witnesses during all stages of the judicial process. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 29, Chapter 13 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 29, Chapter 13 and Title 40, relative to victim services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2021 | |
2021-06-01 | Pub. Ch. 535 | |
2021-05-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-05-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-07 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 26, Nays 0 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0454) |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-05-04 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-05-04 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-05-04 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0454) |
2021-05-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/10/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/10/2021 |
2021-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0513 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 535