TN HB0744 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends from 10 days to 10 business days the time that the state fire marshal has to wait before holding a hearing concerning destroying fireworks seized in violation of state law in order to give the owner, when the owner is not known, time to claim ownership. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, extends from 10 days to 10 business days the time that the state fire marshal has to wait before holding a hearing concerning destroying fireworks seized in violation of state law in order to give the owner, when the owner is not known, time to claim ownership. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 67 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1381 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee