TN HB0741 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Action def. in Health Committee to First Calendar of 2020
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, corrects a reference to the insurance and banking committee of the house of representatives by replacing it with a reference to the insurance committee of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 8 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, corrects a reference to the insurance and banking committee of the house of representatives by replacing it with a reference to the insurance committee of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 8 and Title 71.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16HouseAction def. in Health Committee to First Calendar of 2020
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 4/16/2019
2019-04-09HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2019-04-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 4/10/2019
2019-04-03HouseAction Def. in s/c Public Health Subcommittee to 4/10/2019
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
2019-03-27HouseAction Def. in s/c Public Health Subcommittee to 4/3/2019
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-03-19HouseAssigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee
2019-03-19HouseRef. to Health Committee-- Government Operations for Review
2019-02-07HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1467 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback