TN HB0740 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 468
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, replaces the department of economic and community development with the Tennessee higher education commission as the state agency charged with administering grants related to work-based learning programs; revises related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 11; Title 49, Chapter 7 and Title 50.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, replaces the department of economic and community development with the Tennessee higher education commission as the state agency charged with administering grants related to work-based learning programs; revises related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 11; Title 49, Chapter 7 and Title 50.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Pub. Ch. 468
2019-05-29 Effective date(s) 07/01/2019
2019-05-24 Signed by Governor.
2019-05-17HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-05-14SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-05-10HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-05-08HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-05-01SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2019-05-01SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0392)
2019-05-01SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0450)
2019-05-01SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-05-01SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-05-01HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-05-01HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-05-01HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0508)
2019-05-01HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0402)
2019-04-30HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar #2 for 4/30/2019
2019-04-30HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/30/2019
2019-04-30HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-30HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/30/2019
2019-04-30HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019
2019-04-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/25/2019
2019-04-17HousePlaced behind the budget
2019-04-16HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-16HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-04-16HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Education for 4/16/2019
2019-04-09HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education
2019-04-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 4/9/2019
2019-04-02HouseNo Action Taken
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 4/2/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Education
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1259 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 468

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback