TN HB0738 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-28 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces from 100 percent to 80 percent the amount of funds received for funeral services and merchandise to be held in trust pursuant to a pre-need funeral contract funded by trust deposit; requires the contract to disclose to the purchaser in boldface type the percentage of funds the seller is required to trust along with the name of the trust officer, the trust institution, and their respective addresses and phone numbers. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 62, Chapter 5, relative to pre-need funeral contracts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | House | Withdrawn. |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1091 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-11 - Withdrawn.