TN HB0738 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Failed for lack of motion in: Safety & Funding Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, removes the allocation of proceeds from the sale of Choose Life new specialty earmarked license plates to New Life Resources; allocates funds from the sale of such plates to a special fund to be used for providing grants to eligible nonprofit agencies providing adoption social services. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 2 and Section 55-4-350.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, removes the allocation of proceeds from the sale of Choose Life new specialty earmarked license plates to New Life Resources; allocates funds from the sale of such plates to a special fund to be used for providing grants to eligible nonprofit agencies providing adoption social services. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 2 and Section 55-4-350.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12HouseFailed for lack of motion in: Safety & Funding Subcommittee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/12/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1490 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation & Safety Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback