TN HB0732 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/26/2019
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Hearing: Mar 26 @ 10:30 am in House Hearing Room III
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, expands the authorization to authorize, regulate, and control the commercial use of pedal carriages and rickshaws to any municipality or metropolitan government in the state and not just home rule municipalities and metropolitan governments. - Amends TCA Section 55-26-102.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, expands the authorization to authorize, regulate, and control the commercial use of pedal carriages and rickshaws to any municipality or metropolitan government in the state and not just home rule municipalities and metropolitan governments. - Amends TCA Section 55-26-102.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/26/2019
2019-03-19HouseAction def. in Transportation Committee to 3/26/2019
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-12HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/12/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0595 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-14 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback