TN HB0730 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Reset on Final cal. of Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, increases the penalty for second and third convictions of driving under the influence to a Class E felony with a minimum sentence of 11 months, 29 days; increases the minimum sentence for fourth and fifth convictions to 11 months, 29 days. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, increases the penalty for second and third convictions of driving under the influence to a Class E felony with a minimum sentence of 11 months, 29 days; increases the minimum sentence for fourth and fifth convictions to 11 months, 29 days. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06HouseReset on Final cal. of Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/6/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0683 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-19 - Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback