TN HB0724 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 335
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 335
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires county and municipal mayors, and any other authorities, who appoint members to municipal solid waste regional boards to strive to ensure that at least two elected officials serve on each regional board; authorizes the department of environment and conservation to provide guidelines and best practices for composting and recycling to regional board members, advisory committees, and Class I, Class III, and Class IV landfill owners and operators.
Title
As enacted, requires county and municipal mayors, and any other authorities, who appoint members to municipal solid waste regional boards to strive to ensure that at least two elected officials serve on each regional board; authorizes the department of environment and conservation to provide guidelines and best practices for composting and recycling to regional board members, advisory committees, and Class I, Class III, and Class IV landfill owners and operators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 335 | |
2017-05-01 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-04-27 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/1/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/27/2017 |
2017-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-04-05 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0527 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 335