TN HB0720 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-01 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits any public utility from collecting outstanding underpaid fees resulting from an error by the public utility's employee or agent beyond six months from date of erroneous bill. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 34; Title 7, Chapter 82; Title 28, Chapter 3, Part 3; Title 65 and Title 68, Chapter 221, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits any public utility from collecting outstanding underpaid fees resulting from an error by the public utility's employee or agent beyond six months from date of erroneous bill. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 34; Title 7, Chapter 82; Title 28, Chapter 3, Part 3; Title 65 and Title 68, Chapter 221, Part 2.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-01 Withdrawn.
2011-04-13 Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Commerce Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
2011-04-06 Placed on s/c cal Commerce Subcommittee for 4/13/2011
2011-03-02 Assigned to s/c Commerce Sub-committee
2011-02-17 P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee
2011-02-16 Intro., P1C.
2011-02-14 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0328 (Crossfiled) 2011-02-09 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback