TN HB0714 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 470
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 470
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that an employee of a county or municipality is not entitled to back pay if the employee is arrested and placed on administrative leave and then voluntarily separates from employment, even if the charges are dropped or the employee is found not guilty, or is terminated for reasons other than the arrest; requires that the records of the administrative actions be preserved. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5, Part 2 and Title 7, Chapter 51, Part 17.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 5, Part 2 and Title 7, Chapter 51, Part 17, relative to employees of local governments who have been arrested.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Hurt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 470 | |
2021-05-03 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-30 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0610 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-21 - Effective date(s) 05/18/2021