TN HB0707 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-4)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 259
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-4)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 259
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that the exemptions from the licensure and regulatory requirements for medical physicians apply to surgeons of the United States army, navy, air force or marine hospital service regardless of the hospital or practice site, if the surgeon's practice is part of the surgeon's authorized military service or training. - Amends TCA Section 63-6-204.
Title
As enacted, clarifies that the exemptions from the licensure and regulatory requirements for medical physicians apply to surgeons of the United States army, navy, air force or marine hospital service regardless of the hospital or practice site, if the surgeon's practice is part of the surgeon's authorized military service or training. - Amends TCA Section 63-6-204.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Cameron Sexton [R] | Rep. John Windle [D] | Rep. Joe Pitts [D] |
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Curtis Johnson [R] | Rep. Michael Curcio [R] |
Rep. John Crawford [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Roger Kane [R] | Rep. Dennis Powers [R] |
Rep. Sheila Butt [R] | Rep. Kelly Keisling [R] | Rep. Jason Zachary [R] | Rep. Ron Travis [R] |
Rep. John Clemmons [D] | Rep. Rick Staples [D] | Rep. Harry Brooks [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] |
Rep. Mark White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 259 | |
2017-04-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-20 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-04-13 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Health Subcommittee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0845 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-11 - Pub. Ch. 259