TN HB0700 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 23-2)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - Taken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, exempts drivers and passengers over 21 years of age from the requirement to wear a crash helmet while operating or riding in motorcycles, motor-driven cycles, and motorized bicycles, if the person is covered by health or medical insurance other than insurance through TennCare; makes a violation of the helmet law a secondary offense. - Amends TCA Section 55-9-302.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, exempts drivers and passengers over 21 years of age from the requirement to wear a crash helmet while operating or riding in motorcycles, motor-driven cycles, and motorized bicycles, if the person is covered by health or medical insurance other than insurance through TennCare; makes a violation of the helmet law a secondary offense. - Amends TCA Section 55-9-302.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-22HouseTaken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2016-03-16HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/22/2016
2016-03-02HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-02-25HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-02-23HouseTaken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2016-02-17HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 2/23/2016
2016-02-16HouseAction def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 2/23/2016
2016-02-10HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 2/16/2016
2016-02-09HouseAction def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 2/16/2016
2016-02-03HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 2/9/2016
2016-02-03HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2016-01-28HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-01-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/3/2016
2016-01-27HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 2/3/2016
2016-01-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 1/27/2016
2016-01-14HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-01-12HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-04-14HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 2016
2015-04-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/15/2015
2015-04-08HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2015-04-07HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2015-04-01HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 4/7/2015
2015-04-01HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
2015-03-25HousePlaced on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 4/1/2015
2015-03-25HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
2015-03-18HousePlaced on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/25/2015
2015-02-19HouseAssigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
2015-02-18HouseP2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
2015-02-12HouseIntro., P1C.
2015-02-11HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0925 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-22 - Failed in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Comm

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback