TN HB0700 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-02 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes at a court's discretion attorney fees to be awarded to an injured party in a nuisance suit. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes at a court's discretion attorney fees to be awarded to an injured party in a nuisance suit. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 3.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-04-02 Withdrawn.
2009-02-18 Assigned to s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD
2009-02-18 P2C, ref. to Judiciary
2009-02-12 Intro., P1C.
2009-02-11 Filed for intro.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback