TN HB0699 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 213
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 213
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes the Tennessee State Plane Coordinate System as new system of defining and stating geographic positions and locations in Tennessee. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 1, Part 1; Title 4, Chapter 16 and Title 66, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, establishes the Tennessee State Plane Coordinate System as new system of defining and stating geographic positions and locations in Tennessee. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 1, Part 1; Title 4, Chapter 16 and Title 66, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Pub. Ch. 213 | |
2019-05-01 | Effective date(s) 04/23/2019 | |
2019-04-23 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-04-16 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-15 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-12 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment #1 (SA0222) withdrawn. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/11/2019 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/11/2019 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-03-26 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-03-25 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2019-03-25 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0086) |
2019-03-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0997 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 213