TN HB0698 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires managed health insurance issuers to update the issuer's comprehensive listing available to covered persons and healthcare providers of participating providers and facilities at least every six months for web-based materials instead of annually for printed materials. - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, requires managed health insurance issuers to update the issuer's comprehensive listing available to covered persons and healthcare providers of participating providers and facilities at least every six months for web-based materials instead of annually for printed materials. - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0539 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee