TN HB0697 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-14 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-14 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts from sales and use tax the gross receipts derived from the sale of diapers for use by children. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3 and Section 67-6-102.
Title
As introduced, exempts from sales and use tax the gross receipts derived from the sale of diapers for use by children. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3 and Section 67-6-102.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0416 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-07 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Revenue Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means