TN HB0696 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-18 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Doctor of Medical Science Act." - Amends TCA Title 63.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "Doctor of Medical Science Act." - Amends TCA Title 63.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-18HouseWithdrawn.
2018-01-17HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
2018-01-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 1/17/2018
2017-03-29HouseAction Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 1st Calendar of 2018
2017-03-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
2017-03-22HouseReset on Final cal. of Health Subcommittee
2017-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/22/2017
2017-02-22HouseSponsor change.
2017-02-22HouseSponsor(s) withdrawn.
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
2017-02-13HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee-- Government Operations for Review
2017-02-09HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-02-08HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0850 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-18 - Withdrawn.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback