TN HB0695 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 400
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 400
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates sales and use tax exemption for sale of public safety and public works-related goods to certain nonprofit property owners associations; exemption limited to $25,000 in sales and use taxes each year that would otherwise be imposed. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Title
As enacted, creates sales and use tax exemption for sale of public safety and public works-related goods to certain nonprofit property owners associations; exemption limited to $25,000 in sales and use taxes each year that would otherwise be imposed. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 400 | |
2019-05-01 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-04-30 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar #2 for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-30 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-30 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-30 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1455 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 400