TN HB0694 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 120
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, excludes from the definition of marijuana a cannabidiol product approved as a prescription medication by the United States Food and Drug Administration. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-402.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, excludes from the definition of marijuana a cannabidiol product approved as a prescription medication by the United States Food and Drug Administration. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-402.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-19 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 120
2017-03-30HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-30HouseComp. SB subst.
2017-03-23HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/30/2017
2017-03-22HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/23/2017
2017-03-21HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2017-03-15HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/21/2017
2017-03-15HouseRec. for pass; ref to Health Committee
2017-03-08HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/15/2017
2017-03-07HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2017-03-01HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/7/2017
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2017-02-13HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee-- Health
2017-02-09HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-02-08HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0385 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 120

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback