TN HB0693 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 404
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 404
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the bureau of TennCare, the department of health, and the department of finance and administration to jointly develop certain plans and reports concerning diabetes to be made to the health and welfare committee of the senate and the health committee of the house every two years. - Amends TCA Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, requires the bureau of TennCare, the department of health, and the department of finance and administration to jointly develop certain plans and reports concerning diabetes to be made to the health and welfare committee of the senate and the health committee of the house every two years. - Amends TCA Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO DEFER TO HEEL (Y: 44 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 404 | |
2015-04-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-21 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2015 |
2015-04-15 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/20/15 |
2015-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/8/2015 |
2015-03-31 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-17 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/17/2015 |
2015-03-10 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/10/2015 |
2015-02-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2015-02-18 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0988 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-20 - Pub. Ch. 404