TN HB0692 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-15 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-15 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces from 60 to 50 the number of days within which a court clerk is required to notify the TBI of a person's conviction for an animal abuse offense for purposes of placing the person on the animal abuser registry. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40, Chapter 39, Part 1; Title 44; Title 47; Title 62; Title 63, Chapter 12; Title 68 and Title 70.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39; Title 40, Chapter 39, Part 1; Title 44; Title 47; Title 62; Title 63, Chapter 12; Title 68 and Title 70, relative to animal welfare.
Sponsors
Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Vincent Dixie [D] | Rep. Sam McKenzie [D] |
Rep. Jesse Chism [D] | Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0586 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee