TN HB0690 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 173
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes the board of examiners in psychology to designate as a health service provider in this state, a person who has held a valid license or certificate to practice psychology in another state under certain conditions. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 63, Chapter 11.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Title 63, Chapter 11, relative to psychologist licensure.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-25 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 173
2023-03-30HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-03-30HouseComp. SB subst.
2023-03-27HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/30/2023
2023-03-27HouseReset on Regular Cal. for 3/30/23
2023-03-23HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/27/2023
2023-03-22HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/23/2023
2023-03-21HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2023-03-15HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/21/2023
2023-03-15HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2023-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/15/2023
2023-03-08HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2023-03-01HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2023-02-23HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 3/1/2023
2023-02-22HouseNo Action Taken
2023-02-15HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 2/22/2023
2023-02-14HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2023-02-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/14/2023
2023-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
2023-02-01HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee
2023-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-26HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0953 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-25 - Effective date(s) 04/17/2023, 01/01/2024

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback