TN HB0690 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that credit for previous service only applies to service provided to the employer or its predecessor and not service in any other capacity. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 25; Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36 and Title 8, Chapter 37.
Title
As introduced, clarifies that credit for previous service only applies to service provided to the employer or its predecessor and not service in any other capacity. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 25; Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36 and Title 8, Chapter 37.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-19 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2015-02-18 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0609 (Crossfiled) 2015-02-12 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0690&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0690.pdf |