TN HB0690 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-06 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-06 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, declares that citizens of Tennessee are free to exercise the right to bear arms and any executive order seeking to restrict that right will not be recognized or enforced. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
As introduced, declares that citizens of Tennessee are free to exercise the right to bear arms and any executive order seeking to restrict that right will not be recognized or enforced. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2013-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2013-02-04 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0892 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-21 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Jud. Comm
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0690&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB0690.pdf |