TN HB0686 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 282
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, prohibits disclosure of certain information by an advocate in regard to a victim of domestic violence, sexual assault, stalking, or human trafficking in a judicial, legislative, or administrative proceeding unless the victim gives express written consent. - Amends TCA Title 24; Title 36 and Title 39.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 24; Title 36 and Title 39, relative to a victim advocate's communications.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-04 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 282
2023-04-13HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-04-13HouseComp. SB subst.
2023-04-11HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-04-06HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/13/2023
2023-04-05HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/6/2023
2023-03-30HouseAction def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to Next Calendar
2023-03-29HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/30/2023
2023-03-28HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2023-03-23HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-03-22HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/28/2023
2023-03-21HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2023-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/21/2023
2023-03-14HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/21/2023
2023-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/14/2023
2023-03-07HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-03-07HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/14/2023
2023-03-06HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-03-01HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/7/2023
2023-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2023-02-01HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2023-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-26HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1205 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-04 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback