TN HB0686 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes implementation of a statewide collaborative pharmacy practice agreement specific to epinephrine auto-injectors; authorizes pharmacists licensed in, and practicing in, this state to dispense epinephrine auto-injectors; makes other related changes. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 49, Chapter 50, Part 16; Title 53; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 49, Chapter 50, Part 16; Title 53; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to epinephrine.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Beck [D] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-13 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/13/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | No Action Taken |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/1/2022 |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0980 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee